U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01244-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Angel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.