U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00569
  • Case Name: Kristich v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Extend (other)]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 01, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 01, 2022: [Motion for 2255 Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.