U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00567
  • Case Name: Emmanuel T. Trucking, LLP et al v. JP Gomez Transport, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 16, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 12, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 06, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 19, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 16, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • August 04, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • August 01, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 01, 2022: [Counterclaim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.