U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:10-cr-03231-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Waldo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.