U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-01742-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 24, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 03, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.