U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yates
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 04, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.