U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01261-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nicolas-Sebastian
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 21, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.