U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00574
  • Case Name: Baker v. City of Truth or Consequences et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 10, 2023: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • January 06, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 06, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • December 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 26, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.