U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Estrada-Rivera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Bond]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 04, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.