U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00577
  • Case Name: Gutierrez v. Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • January 12, 2023: [Extend (other)]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Setting Briefing Schedule]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • October 27, 2022: [Seal]
  • October 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 03, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 03, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.