U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01241-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Upshaw
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.