U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00564
  • Case Name: Escamilla et al v. Vera et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Status Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • September 22, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.