U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00189-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morgan, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 09, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.