U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00850-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 10, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 08, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • August 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.