U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00589
  • Case Name: Alvarez v. Oreion Motors LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 29, 2022: [Vacate]
  • November 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 18, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 01, 2022: [Counterclaim]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • October 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 24, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • October 18, 2022: [Provisional Discovery Plan]
  • October 11, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 08, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.