U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00588
  • Case Name: Folse v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Petition]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order to Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Motion for 2255 Relief]
  • September 06, 2022: [Mail Returned]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 05, 2022: [Motion for 2255 Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.