U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00587
  • Case Name: Burnside v. Monarch Real Estate Corp. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • August 10, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Proceed 28 U.S.C. 1915]
  • August 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.