U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00584
  • Case Name: Benavides et al v. Ladner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 11, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 10, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • January 09, 2023: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • January 05, 2023: [Leave to File Document]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • December 13, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 16, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 15, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
  • August 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 08, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 05, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.