U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00582
  • Case Name: Dillard v. Curative, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 05, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 04, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 06, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 06, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 08, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.