U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 16, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 11, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.