U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00592
  • Case Name: Carr v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 25, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 11, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 09, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • August 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.