U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00593
  • Case Name: Vasquez v. Tafoya-Lucero et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2025
  • January 25, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • August 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.