U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01322-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [CJA Appointment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 17, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 10, 2022: [Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.