U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01320-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maestas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.