U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01321-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carpenter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [CJA Appointment]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Return of Exhibits]
  • December 13, 2022: [Jury Notes]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2022: [Court's Jury Instructions]
  • December 09, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 01, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 01, 2022: [In Limine]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 23, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 23, 2022: [Witness List]
  • November 23, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 23, 2022: [In Limine]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of JERS Utilization]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.