U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00556
  • Case Name: Parraz v. The Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Stipulation]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.