U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00596
  • Case Name: Waked et al v. Kerr et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 14, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.