U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00600
  • Case Name: Garcia v. Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • December 06, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • December 06, 2022: [Seal]
  • December 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.