U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Koch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • September 07, 2022: [Discovery Order]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 12, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.