U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00599
  • Case Name: Hurtado et al v. AM Transport Services, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Compel]
November, 2024
  • November 11, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 23, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 23, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 23, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 20, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Remand]
  • September 09, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 09, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 23, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
  • August 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 19, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 19, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 12, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.