U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00604
  • Case Name: Doe v. Board of County Commissioners of the County of Bernalillo et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction Hearing]
  • September 06, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 06, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • August 18, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 18, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • August 16, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.