U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00609
  • Case Name: Green et al v. Kimberly-Clark de Mexico S.A.B. de C.V. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Stay]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Stay]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 10, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 04, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.