U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00608
  • Case Name: Youngers et al v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • September 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 24, 2022: [Stay]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 19, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 19, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • August 17, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 16, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.