U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01318-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Willis, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 12, 2023: [Discovery Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [CJA Appointment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 22, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 16, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.