U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00611
  • Case Name: Estrada v. City of Albuquerque et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 22, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 17, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
  • August 16, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.