U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01347-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castillo-Yanez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 15, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.