U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01345-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Meraz-Vasquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order to Prepare Petty PSR (Text Only)]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 23, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.