U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00614
  • Case Name: Feierman et al v. The United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • December 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 02, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.