U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00595
  • Case Name: Baca v. Albuquerque Studios Corp. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • August 18, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.