U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • May 13, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • May 12, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • May 12, 2025: [Witness List]
  • May 12, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 02, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 26, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 19, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.