U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00616
  • Case Name: Vega v. Metropolitan Direct Property and Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Minute Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.