U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Charley v. The United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2023: [Summons Issued]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 02, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 25, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 13, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 29, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • September 28, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.