U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00618
  • Case Name: PULTE HOMES OF NEW MEXICO, INC. et al v. CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Initial Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 24, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • October 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 13, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • October 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 03, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • October 03, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 23, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • September 23, 2022: [Association Dues Received]
  • September 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.