U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00617
  • Case Name: White v. TTS Logistics et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 02, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 27, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 19, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • August 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.