U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00747-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Glumace
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 08, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • August 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 26, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 19, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.