U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00989-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benally
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.