U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00622
  • Case Name: Emerick v. Board of County Commissioners of the County of Bernalillo et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Discovery]
  • January 19, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 19, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 05, 2023: [Stay]
  • January 05, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 20, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • September 07, 2022: [Vacate]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 22, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 22, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.