U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-03284-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coleman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 31, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 22, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.