U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00627
  • Case Name: United States of America v. 2021 Can Am Maverick XRS VIN: 3JBVXAV44MK005691 et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Declaration]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Declaration]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.