U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00602
  • Case Name: Ochoa v. San Juan County Board of Commissioners et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 22, 2022: [Jury Demand]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.